EP1143090 - Vehicular electronic key system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshiki, Onuma 101-2, Shake Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-0424 / JP | 02 /
Teppei, Nagano D-423, 920-1, Kurihara Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0013 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302932.7 | 28.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000100970 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000100970 | JP20000100971 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000100971 | JP20010066264 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001066264 | JP20010066265 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001066265 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143090 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143090 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143090 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, B60R25/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B60R25/00 (EP,US);
B60R25/245 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C2209/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | E05B49/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Schlüsselsystem für Fahrzeug | [2001/41] | English: | Vehicular electronic key system | [2001/41] | French: | Système de clef électronique pour véhicule | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19833451 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0426114 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, line 38 - column 12, line 29 *; | [A]DE19711901 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 65 * * column 7, line 35 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0523602 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 28 * |