Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
12.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
25.10.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.07.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.03.2003 | Renewal fee | |
14.03.2003 | First examination report | |
10.03.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
05.11.2002 | Change - extension states | |
13.07.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
07.06.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] |
19.10.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |