Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010107542 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001335321 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU778656B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2004 | B2 | AU3140501 | 29.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1160202 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2342523 | 24.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1205126C | 08.06.2005 | C | CN1324766 | 05.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW593153B | 21.06.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6645460 | 11.11.2003 | B2 | US2001056037 | 27.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000152556 | 24.05.2000 |