EP1160202 - Titanium hydroxide, photocatalyst produced from the same and photocatalytic coating agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakatani, Yoshiaki 2-6-521, Ikku-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | 02 /
Koike, Hironobu 11-28, Hoshigoe-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | 03 /
Ando, Hiroyuki 2-6-332, Ikku-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302989.7 | 29.03.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000152556 | 24.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000152556 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160202 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/04, C01G23/053, B01J35/00, B01J21/06 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
C01G23/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,US);
C01G23/053 (EP,US);
C01P2002/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/35] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Titanhydroxid, aus diesem hergestellter Photokatalysator und photokatalytisches Beschichtungsmittel | [2001/49] | English: | Titanium hydroxide, photocatalyst produced from the same and photocatalytic coating agent | [2001/49] | French: | Hydroxyde de titane, photocatalysateur et agent photocatalytique de revêtement | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU783234 ; | [X]JPH0971418 ; | JPH0971418 [ ]; | [XA]JPH02196028 ; | [A]GB427339 (TITAN CO AS); | [A]WO9843733 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]EP1027924 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP]); | [PXA]EP1065169 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [EA]EP1095908 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | by applicant | JP2000152556 |