EP1143249 - Test methods and devices for analyte isoforms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alere Switzerland GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 28 6300 Zug / CH | [2010/36] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 28 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 10 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2002/18] | For:GB
IE
Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2001/51] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butlin, Lorraine Diane, @c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
Coley, John, @c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
Eida, Stephen J., @Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 04 /
Gani, Mohamed M., @c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [2014/03] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
Butlin, Lorraine Diane, c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02 /
Coley, John, c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | |||
03 /
Eida, Stephen J., Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | |||
04 /
Gani, Mohamed M., c/o Unilever Rch. Colworth Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Representative(s) | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Keith W Nash & Co, Pearl Assurance House, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303130.7 | 02.04.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | EP20000302811 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: EP 00302811 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143249 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143249 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143249 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/76, G01N33/577, C07K16/26 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP);
C07K16/26 (EP);
G01N33/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/41] | Title | German: | Testverfahren und Vorrichtungen für Analytisoformen | [2001/41] | English: | Test methods and devices for analyte isoforms | [2001/41] | French: | Méthodes d'essai et dispositifs pour les isoformes d'un analyte | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 27.03.2003 | [2003/30] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | IE | 02.04.2014 | LU | 02.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9941584 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]FR2662804 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0193880 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0328248 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [A]EP0173341 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]); | [A]US4921808 (SCHNEYER ALAN L [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9941584 |