EP1142534 - Blood sampling device with adjustable puncture depth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PZ HTL S.A. ul. Daniszewska 4 03-230 Warszawa / PL | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wyszogrodzki, Wojciech 56 X Ostrodzka Str. Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Rutynowski, Wlodzimierz 11/9 Piwowarskiego Str. 00-770 Warszawa / PL | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Silverman, Warren Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303242.0 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | PL20000339530 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: PL 33953000 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142534 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142534 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/15144 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150183 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150824 (EP,US);
A61B5/15111 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Blutentnahmevorrichtung mit verstellbarer Punktionstiefe | [2001/41] | English: | Blood sampling device with adjustable puncture depth | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif de prélévement sanguin avec une profondeur de ponction reglable | [2003/48] |
Former [2001/41] | Dispositif de prelevement sanguin avec ponctionsprofondeur reglable | Examination procedure | 28.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.07.2004 | IT | 14.07.2004 | DE | 15.10.2004 | ES | 25.10.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 14.07.2004 | |
DE | 15.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | DE | 15.10.2004 | |
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | ES | 25.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0885590 (BAYER AG [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 48; figures 2-4 * [Y] 3,5-7,10; | [Y]EP0904790 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 3,10 * page 3, lines 8-53; figures 1,2 *; | [DY]US5356420 (CZERNECKI ANDRZEJ [PL], et al) [DY] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5613978 (HARDING JOHN D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * abstract * |