Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1150286
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
07.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.06.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.09.2003 |
First examination report |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
20.08.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
14.03.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
02.08.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
14.09.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] |