Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001307348 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000119753 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1150286 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | B1 | EP1150286 | 18.09.2002 | A3 | EP1150286 | 31.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2000119753 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60122049T | 28.12.2006 | T2 | DE60122049D1 | 21.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000119753 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6744708 | 01.06.2004 | B2 | US2001033529 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000119753 | 20.04.2000 |