EP1150286 - Near-field optical head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohara, Yoko c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Mitsuoka, Yasayuji c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Oumi, Manabu c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Kasama, Nobuyuki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 05 /
Maeda, Hidetaka c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 06 /
Kato, Kenji c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 07 /
Niwa, Takashi c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303370.9 | 10.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000119753 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000119753 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1150286 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1150286 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150286 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/0909 (EP,US);
G11B7/0916 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/23] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Nahfeldkopf | [2001/44] | English: | Near-field optical head | [2001/44] | French: | Tête optique à champ proche | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US6304527 (ITO KENCHI [JP], et al) [E] 1-18 * from patent family of JP11265520A below; column 1, line 8 - line 11 * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 16 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 19; figures 2-8 * * column 7, line 25 - line 34 * * column 4, line 54 - line 56 *; | [XAY]JPH11265520 ; | [Y]EP0259148 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 1, line 22 - line 42 *; | [Y]US4682315 (UEJIMA ATSUSHI [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * column 1, line 38 - line 46 *; | [Y]US5557597 (LEE CHUL-WOO [KR], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 1, line 35 - line 55 *; | [Y]US5365535 (YAMAGUCHI EIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 21, line 24 - column 22, line 23 *; | [Y]EP0426053 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 13,14 * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 15 *; | [Y]US5859819 (MIYABE KYOKO [JP], et al) [Y] 15,16 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 22 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11265520 A 19990928 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,18 * abstract * [A] 17 [Y] 5-16 |