EP1146675 - Method and device for multiplexing and transmitting a digital audiovisual signal and an additional data signal and method and device for receiving and demultiplexing the digital audiovisual signal and the additional data signal and method and device for recording and reproducing the additional data signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisamatsu, Ryuichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mitsuhashi, Takamichi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saito, Tadashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sakao, Katsutoshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Nakajima, Yasuhisa c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Okamoto, Hiroshige c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/42] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303379.0 | 11.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | JP20000109965 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109965 | JP20000109963 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109963 | JP20000109962 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109962 | JP20000343104 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000343104 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146675 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1146675 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04J3/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
H04H20/74 (EP,US);
H04N7/20 (KR);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/2368 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H20/42 (EP,US);
H04H2201/19 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/28] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Multiplexieren und Übertragen von digitalen audiovisuellen Signalen und von einem digitalen Zusatzsignal und Verfahren und Vorrichtung für den Empfang und zum Entmultiplexieren vom digitalen audiovisuellen Signal und vom digitalen Zusatzsignal und Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Aufzeichnung bzw. Wiedergabe vom digitalen Zusatzsignal | [2001/42] | English: | Method and device for multiplexing and transmitting a digital audiovisual signal and an additional data signal and method and device for receiving and demultiplexing the digital audiovisual signal and the additional data signal and method and device for recording and reproducing the additional data signal | [2001/42] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le multiplexage et pour la transmission d'un signal audiovisuel numérique et d'un signal additionnel numérique, méthode et dispositif pour la réception et pour le démultiplexage de ces signaux ainsi que méthode et dispositif pour l'enregistrement et la reproduction du signal numérique additionnel | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4013204 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0601766 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66* column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 25; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4425973 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 35; claim 1 *; | [A]US5621578 (MATSUMI CHIYOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 17; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9725791 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 15; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0818900 (KENWOOD CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 25; claim 1 *; | [A]US5959796 (MATSUMI CHIYOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 15; claim 1 *; | [A]US6038256 (LINZER ELLIOT N [US], et al) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 32; claim 1 *; | [A]US6044396 (ADAMS MICHAEL B [US]) [A] 1,6,15,17,19,24,31,33,35,44,53,57,66 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 51; claim 1 * |