EP1147890 - Garment loader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REEFDALE Proprietary Limited 143 Woodlands Drive Braeside Victoria 3195 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states REEFDALE Proprietary Limited 143 Woodlands Drive Braeside, Victoria 3195 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eppinger, Otto Richard 143 Woodlands Drive Braeside, Victoria 3195 / AU | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303438.4 | 12.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ06929 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: AU PQ692900 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147890 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/22, B41F15/18 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
B41F15/0863 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Auflader für Kleidungsstücke | [2001/43] | English: | Garment loader | [2001/43] | French: | Chargeur de vêtement | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4875268 (SZARKA SANDOR [US]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [T]WO0125011 (M & R PRINTING EQUIP INC [US]) [T] 1,3* the whole document * |