EP1148114 - Lubricating oil compositions having excellent thermal stabilty, extreme pressure resistance and anti-wear performance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Japan Limited Landmark Plaza 7F, 6-7, Shiba-Keon 1-chome, Minatu-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takayama, Himiko Heights Imura 203, Omaezaki 2386, Omaezaki-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka, 421-0601 / JP | 02 /
Umehara, Katsumi Limpia Nakayari 306, Hosoe 990-1, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka, 421-0421 / JP | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303441.8 | 12.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | JP20000116378 | 18.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000116378 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148114 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148114 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/10, // (C10M141/10, 129:95, 133:52, 133:56, 137:02, 137:04, 137:08, 137:10), C10N30:06, C10N40:04, C10N40:08 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C10M129/95 (EP,US);
C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M133/52 (EP,US);
C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C10M137/02 (EP,US);
C10M137/04 (EP,US);
C10M137/08 (EP,US);
C10M137/105 (EP,US);
C10M2203/10 (EP,US);
C10M2203/102 (EP,US);
C10M2207/287 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/24 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/042 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/043 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2223/10 (EP,US);
C10M2227/061 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/35] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmierölzusammensetzungen mit ausgezeichneten thermischen Eigenschaften, hohem Druckwiderstand und mit vebessertem Verschleissschutzverhalten | [2001/43] | English: | Lubricating oil compositions having excellent thermal stabilty, extreme pressure resistance and anti-wear performance | [2001/43] | French: | Des compositions d'huile lubrifiante ayant une stabilité thermique excellente, une réstistance à pression extreme et une activité anti-usure | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0001790 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-36 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 26 * * page 6, line 7 - line 19 * * page 7, line 26 - line 29 * * page 31, line 5 - line 35 * * page 20, line 7 - line 13; example V *; | [X]WO9839400 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-36 * page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * page 21, paragraph 5; claim 1 *; | [X]US4717490 (SALENTINE CHRISTOPHER G [US]) [X] 1-36 * column 4, line 22 - line 62; claims 1,8 *; | [X]EP0646639 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-36 * page 22, line 1 - line 11; examples I,V *; | [Y]EP0695799 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-36 * page 11, line 33 - line 35 * * page 14, line 29 - line 33 * * page 21, line 1 - line 11; examples I,IV *; | [Y]US5759965 (SUMIEJSKI JAMES L [US]) [Y] 1-36 * examples 5-7; claims 1-16; table III *; | [Y]US5549838 (MIYAGAWA TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-36 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 23 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 23; examples 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0428393 (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES INC [US]) [Y] 1-36 * examples 1-68 *; | [Y]US5358650 (SRINIVASAN SANJAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-36 * example 1; claim 1 * |