EP1148711 - Adaptive mode-switching method for scanning color and grayscale data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crane, Randy T. 1343 Cape Cod Circle Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/43] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303592.8 | 19.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US20000552850 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: US 552850 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148711 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/56 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/56 (EP);
H04N1/40062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/29] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum adaptiven Umschalten des Modus für das Abtasten von Farb- und Grauwertdaten | [2001/43] | English: | Adaptive mode-switching method for scanning color and grayscale data | [2001/43] | French: | Procédé adaptatif de commutation de mode de balayage de données en couleurs et en niveaux de gris | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.06.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0448330 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 1 - line 57 * * page 18, line 9 - line 13 * * page 18, line 20 - line 29 *; | [X]EP0195925 (IBM [US]) [X] 5,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5796928 (TOYOMURA YUUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 7, line 18 - line 24 * * column 8, line 35 - line 47 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 12 *; | [A]US5724440 (FUNADA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5721628 (TAKARAGI YOICHI [JP], et al) |