EP1147855 - Polishing carrier head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Guardian Corporation Suite 105, 14645 N W 77 Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Agere Systems Guardian Corporation Suite 105, 14645 N W 77 Avenue Miami Lakes, Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crevasse, Annette M. 125 Piney Woods Road Apopka, Florida 327003 / US | 02 /
Easter, William G. 5147 Brightmour Circle Orlando, Florida 32837 / US | 03 /
Maze, John A. 10846 Versailles Blvd. Clermont, Florida 34711 / US | 04 /
Miceli, Frank 1702 Bridgeview Circle Orlando, Florida / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303616.5 | 20.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US20000553931 | 21.04.2000 Original published format: US 553931 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1147855 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1147855 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B41/06 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
B24B37/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Polierträgervorrichtung | [2001/43] | English: | Polishing carrier head | [2001/43] | French: | Tête de support de polissage | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/17] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11333714 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11333714 A 19991207 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * abstract * |