EP1152525 - Distortion-compensating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusunoki, Shigeo, Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/45] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303962.3 | 30.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | JP20000132488 | 01.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000132488 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152525 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152525 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H03F1/3247 (EP,US);
H03F1/3288 (EP,US);
H03F1/565 (EP,US);
H03F3/601 (EP,US);
H03F2201/3227 (EP,US);
H03F2201/3233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/17] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verzerrungsausgleichsvorrichtung | [2001/45] | English: | Distortion-compensating apparatus | [2001/45] | French: | Dispositif de compensation de distorsion | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19813703 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 8,11 *; | [X]US4412337 (BICKLEY ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 32; figure 12 *; | [A]US5093637 (ISOTA YOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5404378 (KIMURA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0513402 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1 |