Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
25.04.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
11.10.2007 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
25.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.11.2006 | First examination report | |
08.11.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.09.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
07.07.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
11.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |
15.04.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
19.10.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |