EP1160130 - Vehicular mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strumolo, Gary Steven 18910 Hillcrest Beverly Hills, Michigan 48025 / US | 02 /
Greenberg, Jeffry Allen 3430 Brentwood Court Ann Arbor, Michigan 48108 / US | 03 /
Tijerina, Louis 233 E. Dunedin Road Columbus, Ohio 43214 / US | 04 /
Miller, Ronald Hugh 827 Berkshire Drive Saline, Michigan 48176 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304057.1 | 03.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | US20000580056 | 27.05.2000 Original published format: US 580056 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160130 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160130 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/08 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B60R1/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2006/40] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugspiegel | [2001/49] | English: | Vehicular mirror | [2001/49] | French: | Rétroviseur de véhicule | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/22] | 25.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4620777 (NU TSAI Y [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 11; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6,8-10; | [XY]GB2250250 (OHAYON DAVID) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 30; figure - * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]CA1285410 (ELLIS MURRAY R [CA]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 1 - line 23; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]JPH02144240 ; | [XY]US4264144 (MCCORD ROBERT C) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 54 - line 60; figure - * [Y] 6,8-10; | [AY]US5796532 (KANAZAWA TORU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 4; figures 1A,1B * [Y] 4,6; | [AY]US5115352 (DO ESPIRITO SANTO ANTONIO FERR [BR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 46; figure - * [Y] 8-10 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900820), vol. 014, no. 384, Database accession no. (M - 1013), & JP02144240 A 19900604 (HIDEAKI OTAKA) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * [Y] 6,8-10 | by applicant | US4331382 |