EP1257092 - Dynamic frequency selection in a wireless LAN with channel swapping between access points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Guardian Corporation 9333 S John Young Parkway, Room 301E1211 Orlando Florida 32819 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Agere Systems Guardian Corporation 9333 S John Young Parkway, Room 301E1211 Orlando, Florida 32819 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Patrick Wilhelminastraat 70 7511 DP Enschede / NL | 02 /
Malhorta, Richa De Klomp 75-16 7511 DG Enschede / NL | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304146.2 | 08.05.2001 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257092 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257092 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Frequenzwahl in einem drahtlosen lokalen Netz mit Kanaltausch zwischen Zugriffspunkten | [2002/46] | English: | Dynamic frequency selection in a wireless LAN with channel swapping between access points | [2002/46] | French: | Allocation dynamique de fréquence dans un réseau local sans fil avec échange de canal entre points d'accès | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5933420 (JASZEWSKI GARY M [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * column 2, line 13 - line 50 * * column 3, line 59 - column 9, line 58 * |