EP1158430 - Database annotation and retrieval [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlesworth, Jason Peter Andrew c/o Canon Res. Ctr. Europe Ltd., The Braccans London Road, Bracknell, Berksh. RG12 2XH / GB | 02 /
Garner, Philip Neil c/o Canon Res. Ctr. Europe Ltd., The Braccans London Road, Bracknell, Berksh. RG12 2XH / GB | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304243.7 | 11.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | GB20000011798 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0011798 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1158430 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1158430 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G10L15/06 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
G10L15/12 (EP,US);
G10L2015/025 (EP,US);
G10L2015/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Kommentierung von Datenbanken und Suche in Datenbanken | [2001/48] | English: | Database annotation and retrieval | [2001/48] | French: | Commentaire et récuperation de bases de données | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SCHMID P ET AL, "Automatically generated word pronunciations from phoneme classifier output", STATISTICAL SIGNAL AND ARRAY PROCESSING. MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930427), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0946-4, pages 223 - 226, XP010110434 [X] 1,25-29,52-58 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319275 | [A] - "TEMPLATE AVERAGING FOR ADAPTING A DYNAMIC TIME WARPING SPEECH", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19900401), vol. 32, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 422 - 426, XP000097761 [A] 1,25-29,52-58 * page 423 * | [A] - JAIN N ET AL, "Creating speaker-specific phonetic templates with a speaker-independent phonetic recognizer: implications for voice dialing", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.96CH35903), 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, ATLANTA, GA, USA, 7-10 M, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-3192-3, pages 881 - 884 vol. 2, XP002194439 [A] 1,25-29,52-58 * paragraph [03.5] * * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1996.543262 | [A] - ZOBEL J ET AL, "PHONETIC STRING MATCHING: LESSONS FROM INFORMATION RETRIEVAL", SIGIR FORUM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (1996), pages 166 - 172, XP000870222 [A] 1,25-29,52-58 * abstract * * Paragraph 3 "Edit distances" * |