EP1160335 - Leather coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiang, Jin-Chih 105 Fairview Drive Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19466 / US | 02 /
Chiou, Shang-Jaw 1010 Stonebridge Road Lower Gwynedd, Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 03 /
Schindler, Frederick James 475 Dreshertown Road Ft. Washington, Pennsylvania 19034 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304424.3 | 18.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | US20000208130P | 31.05.2000 Original published format: US 208130 P | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160335 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160335 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C14C11/00, C08F265/06, C09D151/00 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C14C11/003 (EP,KR,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/064 (KR);
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
C09D5/022 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/06, C08F2/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, TR [2002/35] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lederbeschichtungszusammensetzung | [2001/49] | English: | Leather coating composition | [2001/49] | French: | Composition de revêtement de cuir | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 17.09.2003 | [2006/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3078247 (GUSTAV SINN, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 45 * * example 1B *; | [A]US5308890 (SNYDER BARRY S [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * column 3, line 3 - column 6, line 9 * * column 8, line 4 - line 13; table 2 *; | [A]EP0690081 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 53 * * examples B-1; table 1 *; | [DX]US5723182 (CHOI CHOL-YOO [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,6-8 * column 1, line 54 - column 4, line 39 ** examples 2,4; claims 1-6; table 2.1 * |