EP1263077 - Transmission line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERA PATENTS LIMITED Cleeve Road Leatherhead Surrey KT22 7SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states ERA PATENTS LIMITED Cleeve Road Leatherhead Surrey KT22 7SA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanchez, Francisco Javier Vazquez 34 Oakhill Court, Oakhill Road Putney, London SW15 2QH / GB | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304526.5 | 23.05.2001 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263077 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/00, H01P3/08, H01Q13/10 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H01Q13/106 (EP);
H01P1/2013 (EP);
H01P3/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Übertragungsleitung | [2002/49] | English: | Transmission line | [2002/49] | French: | Ligne de transmission | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.07.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4365222 (LAMPERT NORMAN R) [A] 1 * column 1, line 19 - line 35 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 10; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1058335 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 7A *; | [A]US6198437 (WATSON PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 6* column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 67; figure 1 * |