EP1160010 - Humidity adsorbent agent and humidity adsorbent element using thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daikaku, Hiroki 2-5-1-501, Makuharihongo, Hanamigawa-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Takeya 5-30-3, Arakawa, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Teruji 1156-1, Nakayama-cho, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/49] | 01 /
Daikaku, Hiroki 2-5-1-501, Makuharihongo, Hanamigawa-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kobayashi, Takeya 5-30-3, Arakawa, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Yamazaki, Teruji 1-8-4, Dobashi, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304628.9 | 25.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000154700 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000154700 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160010 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160010 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/18, B01D53/28 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/28 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2203/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/37] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Feuchtigkeitsadsorptionsmittel und Feuchtigkeit absorbierendes Element unter Verwendung desselben | [2001/49] | English: | Humidity adsorbent agent and humidity adsorbent element using thereof | [2001/49] | French: | Agent adsorbant l'humidité et élément adsorbant l'humidité utilisant celui-ci | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/38] | 04.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5667560 (DUNNE STEPHEN R [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 6, line 18 - column 8, line 2; figure 1A *; | [X]DE3626887 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-5 * |