EP1162545 - Fast fourier transform (FFT) architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSP Group Ltd. 5 Shenkar Street 46120 Herzliya / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states DSP Group Ltd. 5 Shenkar Street 46120 Herzlia / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinitzky, Gil 36 Jabotinsky Street Azur 58014 / IL | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Flint, Adam W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304852.5 | 01.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | US20000587617 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: US 587617 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162545 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162545 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US);
G06F17/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/41] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schnelle fouriertransformation architektur | [2001/50] | English: | Fast fourier transform (FFT) architecture | [2001/50] | French: | Architecture d'une transformée de fourier rapide (FFT) | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.09.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0889416 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 28 - column 8, line 48 *; | [X]US4996661 (COX ROGER G [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 25 - line 37 * * column 1, line 62 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 27 * * column 7, line 7 - line 42 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 48 *; | [A]US4748579 (ZIBMAN ISRAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 5 - line 61 * * column 3, line 32 - column 6, line 10 *; | [A]US5694347 (IRELAND THOMAS C [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 40 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 56 * * column 6, line 20 - line 47 * * column 6, line 52 - column 8, line 19 * | [A] - BERAUD J P ET AL, "FAST FOURIER TRANSFORM CALCULATING CIRCUIT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (198409), vol. 27, no. 4A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 2184 - 2186, XP000715181 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |