11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
27.07.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
25.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
29.09.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
22.09.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
01.09.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
18.08.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2005 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
20.12.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.12.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
14.12.2005 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
07.10.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.2004 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.10.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2004 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2003 |
First examination report |
|
30.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.03.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
20.11.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
26.07.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
05.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
02.11.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] |