Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1758046 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | EP01304980 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200104484 | 12.12.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | ZA200104484 | 31.05.2001 | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002084211 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1164533 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2006 | B1 | EP1164533 | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE340391T | 15.10.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1329400 | 02.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60123170D1 | 02.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6867687 | 15.03.2005 | B2 | US2002017981 | 14.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200002938 | 12.06.2000 | Type | Divisional application | EP1758046 | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.10.2006 |