EP1164533 - Sideband diversity reader for electronic identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG International Limited 10 Fleet Place Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | [2006/40] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Supersensor (Proprietary) Limited Kernick House, Waterfall Park, Bekker Road Midrand 1685 Gauteng / ZA | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Supersensor (Proprietary) Limited Kernick House, Waterfall Park, Bekker Road Midrand 1685, Gauteng / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Christopher Gordon Gervase 53 Brill Road, Oakley, Aylesbury Bucks. HP18 9QN / GB | [2003/18] |
Former [2001/51] | 01 /
Turner, Christopher Gordon Gervase Remainder of 246 Hofmeyer Road, Agricultural Hld. President Park, Halfway House 2068 / ZA | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304980.4 | 07.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | ZA20000002938 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: ZA 200002938 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164533 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164533 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G06K7/10069 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Title | German: | Leser für unterschiedliche Seitenbänder in einem elektronisches Identifizierungssystem | [2001/51] | English: | Sideband diversity reader for electronic identification system | [2001/51] | French: | Lecteur pour des bandes différentes latérales d'un système d'identification électronique | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06019456.0 / EP1758046 | EP06076743.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2005 | Decision despatched | 24.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2006 | BE | 20.09.2006 | CH | 20.09.2006 | CY | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | FR | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | LI | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | DE | 21.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | GB | 07.06.2007 | IE | 07.06.2007 | LU | 07.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
CY | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
FR | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
GB | 07.06.2007 | ||
IE | 07.06.2007 | ||
LU | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
FR | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
GB | 07.06.2007 | ||
IE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
GB | 07.06.2007 | ||
IE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
IE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
DE | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0410663 (BOSE CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,20* abstract *; | [X]EP0576100 (NEDAP NV [NL]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 37 - line 48; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0845751 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1-11,20 * column 10, line 20 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19847135 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2,20 * figure 4; claim 2 * |