EP1208778 - Adjustable garment holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM, Peter Ar-Fu 20104 Wayne Avenue Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lam, Peter Ar-Fu 20104 Wayne Avenue Torrance, California 90503 / US | 02 /
Siu, Andrew Y.K. 1532 Stanford Avenue Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Morgan, David James Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Morgan, David James Langner Parry, 52 - 54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305093.5 | 12.06.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | US20000699071 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: US 699071 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208778 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1208778 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208778 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/44 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
D06F57/06 (EP,US);
A47G25/443 (EP,US);
D06F57/00 (EP,US);
D06F59/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Kleiderbügel | [2002/22] | English: | Adjustable garment holder | [2002/22] | French: | Cintre ajustable | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | IE | 12.06.2007 | LU | 12.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
IE | 12.06.2007 | ||
LU | 12.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
IE | 12.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE286192 (WINKLER KARL) [X] 9,11-13,15,16 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5456391 (CHANG JOHN [TW]) [X] 17-23 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 10 *; | [AD]US5664710 (LAM PETER AR-FU [US]) [AD] 1-25* the whole document * | Examination | US2362756 | by applicant | DE286192 | US2477873 | US3024954 | US5044535 | US5102019 | WO9402056 | US5511701 | US5664710 |