EP1166792 - Extracts, compounds & pharmaceutical compositions having anti-diabetic activity and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHYTOPHARM PLC Corpus Christi House, 9 West Street Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE18 8HG / GB | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2008/19] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states PHYTOPHARM PLC Corpus Christi House, 9 West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE18 8HG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubin, Ian Duncan 11 Lucknow Drive Nottingham NG3 5EU / GB | 02 /
Cawthorne, Michael Anthony, The Core Laboratory for Life Sciences, University of Buckingham Milton Keynes MK18 1EG / GB | 03 /
Bindra, Jasjit Singh 171 Neptune Drive Groton, Connecticut, CN 06340 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Brown, David Leslie, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2004/48] | Brown, David Leslie HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2002/01] | Silverman, Warren Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305172.7 | 14.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | GB20000016213 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0016213 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166792 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1166792 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166792 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00, A61K31/58, A61K31/7034, A61P3/10 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/78 (EP,US);
A61K36/27 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | A61K35/78, A61K31/58, A61K31/7034, A61P3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2002/01] | A61K35/78, A61K31/57, A61K31/58, A61K31/78, A61P3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Extrakte, Wirkstoffe und pharmazeutische Präparate mit antidiabetischen Eigenschaften und ihre Verwendung | [2007/52] | English: | Extracts, compounds & pharmaceutical compositions having anti-diabetic activity and their use | [2002/01] | French: | Extraits, agents et compositions pharmaceutiques à activité antidiabétique et leur utilisation | [2002/01] |
Former [2002/01] | Extrakten, Wirkstoffe und pharmazeutische Präparate mit antidiabetischen Eigenschaften und ihre Verwendung | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2008 | 26.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Working Group of Indigenous Minorities in Southern Africa, (WIMSA) 8 Bach Street Erklärung von Bern Dienerstrasse 12, CH-8026 Zürich (Schweiz) Windhoek / NA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Working Group of Indigenous Minorities in Southern Africa, (WIMSA) Welfare Organisation, Section 19 of Act 12 of 1979 (Reg. No. WO 136) 8 Bach Street Erklärung von Bern Dienerstrasse 12, CH-8026 Zürich (Schweiz) Windhoek / NA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | 27.05.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2010 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 11.05.2010 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2011 | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.08.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/01] | 21.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 05.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | IE | 14.06.2009 | LU | 14.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
LU | 14.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | ES | 27.10.2008 | |
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4652553 (HAGMANN WILLIAM K [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [A]US5175154 (SCHWARTZ ARTHUR G [US], et al) [A] 1-29* abstract *; | [DX]WO9846243 (CSIR [ZA], et al) [DX] 12-15,19-21,23,24 * abstract *; | [A]FR2771105 (VITASTEROL [FR]) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1099444 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB]) [PX] 12,13,19,20 * abstract * |