EP1163942 - Device for launching confetti [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unique Industries Inc. 2400 South Weccacoe Avenue Pennsylvania Philadelphia 19148-4298 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Unique Industries Inc. 2400 South Weccacoe Avenue Pennsylvania, Philadelphia 19148-4298 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watkins, James O 1924 Orbit Drive, Gaithersburg 20899 Maryland / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305214.7 | 15.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | US20000211954P | 16.06.2000 Original published format: US 211954 P | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1163942 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Classification | IPC: | A63H37/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A63H37/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verstreuen von Konfetti | [2001/51] | English: | Device for launching confetti | [2001/51] | French: | Dispositif pour lancer des confettis | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US825843 | US1663679 | US1153207 | US1491809 | US5620355 | US5634840 | US5531628 | US5403225 | US5556319 | US5624295 | US5823850 |