EP1271160 - Method and apparatus for measuring a signal spectrum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road, P.O. Box 10395 Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware corporation - 395 Page Mill Road, P.O. Box 10395 Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snaddon, Stuart 2F1 39 Ripon Drive Glasgow G12 0DU / GB | 02 /
Schuller, Roy 3F2 92 Montpelier Park Edinburgh EH10 4NG / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Coker, David Graeme, et al Agilent Technologies UK Ltd Legal Dept Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Coker, David Graeme, et al Agilent Technologies UK Ltd, Legal Dept, Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305289.9 | 18.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271160 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271160 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/16 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G01R23/16 (EP,US);
H04B17/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Messung eines Signalspektrums | [2003/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring a signal spectrum | [2003/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil de mesure du spectre d'un signal | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 13.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.04.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11194145 ; | [A]GB2343522 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11194145 A 19990721 (ADVANTEST CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |