EP1168601 - Adaptive distortion-compensation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunsunoki, Shigeo c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/01] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305304.6 | 19.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000195005 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000195005 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168601 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168601 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168601 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H03F1/3247 (EP,US);
H03F1/32 (KR);
H03F1/3282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Adaptive Verzerrungsskompensationseinrichtung | [2002/01] | English: | Adaptive distortion-compensation apparatus | [2002/01] | French: | Dispositif adaptatif pour la compensation de la distortion | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 17.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5101173 (DIPIAZZA GERALD C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3900823 (SOKAL NATHAN O, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - PARK H-M ET AL, "A PREDISTORTION LINEARIZER USING ENVELOPE-FEEDBACK TECHNIQUE WITH SIMPLIFIED CARRIER CANCELLATION SCHEME FOR CLASS-A AND CLASS-AB POWER AMPLIFIERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200006), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 898 - 904, XP000936746 [A] 1-4 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.846715 |