EP1168710 - Method and device for frame forwarding in a switch fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92619-7013 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine California 92619-7013 / US | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine, California 92619-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalkunte, Mohan. Broadcom Corporation 3151 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134-1907 / US | 02 /
Ambe Shekhar. Broadcom Corporation 3151 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134-1907 / US | 03 /
Pullela Soma. Broadcom Corporation 3151 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134-1907 / US | 04 /
Lund Martin. Broadcom Corporation 3151 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134-1907 / US | 05 /
Kadambi Shiri.Broadcom Corporation 3151 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134-1907 / US | 06 /
Battle Jim.Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O.Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92619-7013 / US | 07 /
Tai, Daniel.Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O.Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92619-7013 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305338.4 | 19.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | US20000212592P | 19.06.2000 Original published format: US 212592 P | US20000229305P | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 229305 P | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168710 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168710 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168710 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L12/56 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L12/18 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L45/54 (EP,US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
H04L47/2425 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04L47/245 (EP,US);
H04L47/286 (EP,US);
H04L47/30 (EP,US);
H04L47/32 (EP,US);
H04L47/6205 (EP,US);
H04L47/6215 (EP,US);
H04L47/6225 (EP,US);
H04L49/203 (EP,US);
H04L49/25 (EP,US);
H04L49/254 (EP,US);
H04L49/309 (EP,US);
H04L49/352 (EP,US);
H04L49/608 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L49/9094 (EP,US);
H04L12/1881 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5665 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5679 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5681 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5683 (EP,US);
H04L49/101 (EP,US);
H04L49/201 (EP,US);
H04L49/205 (EP,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Datenrahmenweiterleiten in einer Vermittlungsstelle | [2002/01] | English: | Method and device for frame forwarding in a switch fabric | [2002/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'acheminement de trames de données dans un commutateur | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0571166 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 5,12 * column 22, line 5 - line 29 *; | [A]US5610905 (MURTHY MANOHAR [US], et al) [A] 4,6,11,13 * column 2, line 32 - line 59 *; | [A]US5742597 (HOLT CRAIG SHEPPARD [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8-10* claims 1,3,5,14 *; | [X]US5991297 (PALNATI PRASASTH R [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 26 - line 41 * * claims 1,3 * |