EP1175927 - Video game apparatus, and method for controlling a video game apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Yoichi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nojiri, Kohei c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Udagawa, Hiroshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Masato c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ishigami, Koichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Asano, Haruo c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr., et al D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305578.5 | 27.06.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000195067 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000195067 | JP20000274194 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000274194 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175927 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175927 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, A63F13/10, G06K15/00, G06F9/445, G06F3/12, G06F19/00 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
A63F13/49 (EP,US);
A63F13/95 (EP,US);
A63F2300/206 (EP);
A63F2300/30 (US);
A63F2300/554 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | A63F13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Videospielvorrichtung, und Verfahren zur Kontrolle einer Videospielvorrichtung | [2002/05] | English: | Video game apparatus, and method for controlling a video game apparatus | [2002/05] | French: | Jeu vidéo, et procédé de commande de jeu vidéo | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09739 ; | [A]JPH10181119 ; | [A]JPH11203066 ; | [A]US5224416 (MALIN RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09000739 A 19970107 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 36 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10181119 A 19980707 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11203066 A 19990730 (CANON INC) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |