EP1170039 - A board game [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ononye, Ifeanyi 344 Caledonian Road London N1 1DU / GB | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305639.5 | 28.06.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | GB20000015834 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0015834 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170039 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170039 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/00, A63F3/02, A63F7/06 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
A63F3/00041 (EP);
A63F7/06 (EP);
A63F7/0668 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/02] | A63F3/00, A63F3/02 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/51] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Brettspiel | [2002/02] | English: | A board game | [2002/02] | French: | Jeu de table | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1261680 (KIECHLE HANS [DE]) [X] 1,5,10 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2318746 (TOMY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 *; | [X]GB1241031 (WATERMAN THOMAS DAVID) [X] 1,10 * figure - *; | [X]GB634857 (GABRIEL BEGIN) [X] 1,10 * page 2, line 40 - line 56; figure - * |