EP1176062 - Vehicle air bag system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyasaka, Hiroyuki 70-1-319, Higashikibougaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0826 / JP | 02 /
Maki, Tetsuo 2-13-1-B607 Kanaya Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-0034 / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305783.1 | 04.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000227816 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000227816 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176062 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176062 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176062 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
B60R21/36 (EP,US);
B60R21/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugairbagsystem | [2002/05] | English: | Vehicle air bag system | [2002/05] | French: | Système de coussin gonflable pour véhicule | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2711338 (APPEL HERMANN PROF DR ING) [A] 2-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH07108903 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-5,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07125606 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5931498 (KESHAVARAJ RAMESH [US]) [A] 14-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0967128 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-5,9,10 * column 13, line 39 - column 14, line 49; figures 1-2B,7,20-25 * | by applicant | JPH05281671 | JP2000079859 | JP2000227816 |