EP1170359 - Biojelly-producing microorganism, coating containing said microorganism and anti-fouling method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-0077 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0077 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamori, Naoki 15-13 Osumigaoka 3-chome Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0351 / JP | 02 /
Harada, Akio 41 Yakushidocho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8321 / JP | 03 /
Hayase, Nobuki 3-27 Shinonomecho 1-chome Niihama-shi, Ehime 792-0864 / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/02] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305790.6 | 04.07.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000206228 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000206228 | JP20000206229 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000206229 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170359 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170359 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C09D5/16 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C09D5/1606 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [2002/39] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Biojelly-produzierende Mikroorganismen, diese Mikroorganismen-enthaltender Anstrich und Antifoulingsverfahren | [2002/02] | English: | Biojelly-producing microorganism, coating containing said microorganism and anti-fouling method | [2002/02] | French: | Microorganismes produisant un biojelly, peinture contenant ces microorganismes et procédé d' anti-sallissure | [2002/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 14.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.10.2004 | GB | 04.07.2005 | [2006/35] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 13.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9603311 (SEALFLOCK AB [SE], et al) [X] 3,5,7,8 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 21 - line 25 *; | [YD]EP0702065 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 3,5,7,8 * page 2, line 34 - line 47 *; | [XY] - BOZAL NURIA ET AL, "A new bacterial strain of Antarctica, Alteromonas sp. that produces a heteropolymer slime.", POLAR BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 0722-4060, pages 561 - 567, XP000926650 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 3,5,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00238226 | [X] - KON-YA K ET AL, "Inhibitory effect of bacterial ubiquinones on the settling of barnacle, Balanus amphitrite.", EXPERIENTIA (BASEL), (1995), vol. 51, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4754, pages 153 - 155, XP001024956 [X] 1 * page 154 - page 155 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01929360 | [X] - HOLMSTROM CAROLA ET AL, "Marine Pseudoalteromonas species are associated with higher organisms and produce biologically active extracellular agents.", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY ECOLOGY, (199912), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0168-6496, pages 285 - 293, XP000926656 [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * page 290, column 2, paragraph L - page 291, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-6496(99)00063-X |