EP1170285 - A process for preparing a sulfinate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takatugu c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305794.8 | 04.07.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000204872 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000204872 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170285 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170285 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C313/04 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C07C313/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/39] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Sulfinaten | [2002/02] | English: | A process for preparing a sulfinate | [2002/02] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de sulfinates | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 14.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.11.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3302647 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * example 17 *; | JPS63115855 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002179907 [A] 1,3-6 * abstract; RN 118161-53-8 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890123), vol. 110, no. 4, Database accession no. 25251k, XP002179906 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - J.E. TOTH ET AL, J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 1018 - 1025, XP002166855 [A] 1-3,7 * page 1022, column 2, lines 35-49 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960673l |