EP1174770 - Lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Dijsseldonk, Antonius Johannes Josephus Venbroek 22 5527 BH Hapert / NL | 02 /
Loopstra, Erik Roelof Atlas 7 5591 PJ Heeze / NL | 03 /
Franken, Dominicus Jacobus Petrus Adrianus Schouwberg 5 5508 JA Veldhoven / NL | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Slenders, Petrus Johannes Waltherus, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Slenders, Petrus J. W., et al ASML Netherlands B.V Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/04] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305989.4 | 11.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | EP20000305958 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00305958 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174770 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174770 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G02B26/08, G02B17/08, G02B27/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/70141 (EP);
G02B26/0825 (EP);
G02B7/185 (EP);
G03F7/70258 (EP);
G03F7/70266 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/04] | G03F7/20, G02B7/185, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/06] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat | [2002/04] | English: | Lithographic apparatus | [2002/04] | French: | Appareil lithographique | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 22.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0961149 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,21,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0036] * * claims 1,5,7 * * figure 1 *; | [XDA]US5986795 (CHAPMAN HENRY N [US], et al) [XD] 22 * the whole document * [A] 1-21; | [XDA]US5420436 (SEYA EIICHI [JP], et al) [XD] 22 * the whole document * [A] 1-21 |