EP1179599 - Method for producing lysine derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Masakazu, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Daisuke, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
Onishi, Norimasa, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 04 /
Naito, Masaki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 05 /
Izawa, Kunisuke, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 06 /
Yokozeki, Kenzo, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2002/29] |
Former [2002/07] | 01 /
Nakazawa, Masakazu, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Daisuke, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | |||
03 /
Onishi, Norimasa, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | |||
04 /
Naito, Masaki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | |||
05 /
Izawa, Kunisuki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | |||
06 /
Yokozeki, Kenzo, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Amino Sicence Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306038.9 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | JP20000213181 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000213181 | JP20000334579 | 01.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000334579 | JP20010118508 | 17.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001118508 | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1179599 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1179599 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12P41/00, C12P13/08, C07C227/32, C07C227/04, C07C227/18, C07C227/08, C07C229/26, C07C271/22, C07C233/47, C07C205/15, C07C205/08, C07D233/76, C07D233/96, C07C309/66 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
C07C229/26 (EP,US);
C07C205/08 (EP,US);
C07C205/15 (EP,US);
C07C205/44 (EP,US);
C07C205/51 (EP,US);
C07C227/04 (EP,US);
C07C227/08 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C227/32 (EP,US);
C07C229/20 (EP,US);
C07C233/47 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C309/66 (EP,US);
C07D233/76 (EP,US);
C07D233/96 (EP,US);
C12P13/08 (EP,US);
C12P41/007 (EP,US);
C12P41/009 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/04, C07C229/26 (EP,US);
C07C227/08, C07C229/26 (US,EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/26 (US,EP);
C07C227/32, C07C229/26 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2002/07] | C12P41/00, C12P13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lysinderivat | [2002/07] | English: | Method for producing lysine derivative | [2002/07] | French: | Procédé de production de dérivé de lysine | [2002/07] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1113804 (UNIV MICHIGAN) [X] 19 * page 6, Scheme III and line 5: compound (7) *; | [X]EP0101199 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 19 * page 68 *; | [E]WO02072841 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [E] 18,19 * abstract *; | WO02072841 [ ] (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al); | [DA] - ROBL J A ET AL, "VASOPEPTIDASE INHIBITORS: INCORPORATION OF GEMINAL AND SPIROCYCLIC SUBSTITUTED AZEPINONES IN MERCAPTOACYL DIPEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1999), vol. 42, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 305 - 311, XP001098837 [DA] 1,5,9,13,17-19 * page 306, Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980542f | [L] - TAKENAKA, YASUHIRO ET AL, "Hydantoinase and N-carbamyl-L-amino acid hydrolase from Microbacterium an use for producing optically active amino acids", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 137:243921, URL: STN, XP002235007 [L] 18,19 * abstract * | Examination | - BENEDETTI A. ET AL, "The influence of a second metal component (Cu, Sn, Fe) on Pd/SiO2 activity in the hydrogenation of 2,4-dinitrotoluene", CATALYSIS LETTERS, (1991), vol. 10, pages 215 - 224, XP008078333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00772074 |