EP1177736 - Arm portable information apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitamura, Gen, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306154.4 | 17.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000231974 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000231974 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177736 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177736 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/10, A44C5/00, H01R35/02, G04G1/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
A44C5/0015 (EP,US);
G06F15/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | A44C5/10, A44C5/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/05] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Am Arm getragene Informationseinrichtung | [2002/06] | English: | Arm portable information apparatus | [2002/06] | French: | Dispositif d'information portable au bras | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3977176 (MURAKAMI TOMOMI, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 23; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4412751 (JEANNET PIERRE [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 5 - line 9; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5141446 (OZOUF RENE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 9 - line 10 * * column 1, line 53; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0660204 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 4, line 28 - line 30 * * column 14, line 50 - column 15, line 21 * * column 16, line 2 - line 39 * * column 25, line 36 - line 42 *; | [XP]FR2793898 (TIMENTEL PTY LTD [AU]) [XP] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 5, line 4 - line 19 * * page 6, line 9 - line 15; figure 2 * |