EP1182456 - Biosensors with porous chromatographic membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i-SENS, INC. 447-1 Wolgae-dong, Nowon-ku 139-701 Seoul / KR | [2009/46] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states i-SENS, INC. 447-1 Wolgae-dong, Nowon-ku 139-701 Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cui, Gang 19 Cho Shinheungkamyeongwhiwi Younkil-si Kilimsung / CN | 02 /
Yoo, Jae-Hyun 301 Okwoi-Kwan Dept. Chemistry Kwangoon University 447-1 Wolgye-dong Nowon-ku, 139-701 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Woo, Byung Wook D319-808 Jukong Apt. Sanggye 6-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-206 / KR | 04 /
Oh, Hyun Joon D6-1507 Hanshin 2 Cha Apt. 451 Sanggye5-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-903 / KR | 05 /
Nam, Hakhyun D101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1 Beon3-dong Kangbuk-ku Seoul139-903 / KR | 06 /
Cha, Geun Sig 10/9 5-305 Keumkang Park Village 170 Pyeongchang-dong Chongro-kuSeoul110-012 / KR | 07 /
Kim, Moon Hwan DMa-501 Dongwon Apt. 363 Kogangbon-dong Ojung-ku, Buchun-si 421-190 Kyunggido / KR | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
Cui, Gang 19 Cho Shinheungkamyeongwhiwi Younkil-si Kilimsung / CN | ||
02 /
Yoo, Jae-Hyun 301 Okwoi-Kwan Dept. Chemistry Kwangoon University 447-1 Wolgye-dong Nowon-ku, 139-701 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Woo, Byung Wook #319-808 Jukong Apt. Sanggye 6-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-206 / KR | |||
04 /
Oh, Hyun Joon #6-1507 Hanshin 2 Cha Apt. 451 Sanggye5-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-903 / KR | |||
05 /
Nam, Hakhyun #101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1 Beon3-dong Kangbuk-ku Seoul139-903 / KR | |||
06 /
Cha, Geun Sig 10/9 #5-305 Keumkang Park Village 170 Pyeongchang-dong Chongro-kuSeoul110-012 / KR | |||
07 /
Kim, Moon Hwan #Ma-501 Dongwon Apt. 363 Kogangbon-dong Ojung-ku, Buchun-si 421-190 Kyunggido / KR | |||
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
Cui, Gang 19 Cho Shinheungkamyeongwhiwi Younkil-si Kilimsung / CN | ||
02 /
Yoo, Jae-Hyun 316-42 Haengdang dong Sungdong-ku Seoul 133-072 / KR | |||
03 /
Woo, Byung Wook #319-808 Jukong Apt. Sanggye 6-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-206 / KR | |||
04 /
Oh, Hyun Joon #6-1507 Hanshin 2 Cha Apt. 451 Sanggye5-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-903 / KR | |||
05 /
Nam, Hakhyun #101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1 Beon3-dong Kangbuk-ku Seoul139-903 / KR | |||
06 /
Cha, Geun Sig 10/9 #5-305 Keumkang Park Village 170 Pyeongchang-dong Chongro-kuSeoul110-012 / KR | |||
07 /
Kim, Moon Hwan #Ma-501 Dongwon Apt. 363 Kogangbon-dong Ojung-ku, Buchun-si 421-190 Kyunggido / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Mounteney, Simon James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306225.2 | 19.07.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | KR20000041962 | 21.07.2000 Original published format: KR 2000041962 | KR20010027117 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001027117 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182456 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182456 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182456 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N33/48, G01N33/49, G01N33/50, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/26, G01N27/30, G01N27/403 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
G01N30/90 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | G01N33/487, G01N33/48, G01N33/49 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Biosensoren mit porösen chromatographischen Membranen | [2002/09] | English: | Biosensors with porous chromatographic membranes | [2002/09] | French: | Biodétecteurs avec des membranes chromatographiques poreuses | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 27.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09004694.7 / EP2071331 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | IT | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | IE | 19.07.2010 | LU | 19.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
NL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
LU | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01152357 ; | [A]WO9005910 (I STAT CORP [US]) [A] 1-32 * figures 1-8B *; | [Y]WO9204868 (WONG DAVID K [US]) [Y] 2-4,32 * page 10, line 10 - page 17, line 9 *; | [Y]WO9945387 (HELLER E & CO [US], et al) [Y] 27 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0974840 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 22,23 * column 7, line 20 - line 40 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 26 *; | [DXY] - GANG C. ET AL, "A disposable amperometric sensor screen printed on a Nitrocellulose Strip: A Glucose Biosensor Employing Lead Oxide as an Interference-Removing Agent", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000415), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 1925 - 1929, XP002223448 [DX] 1,24-26 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,22,23,27,29,32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac991213d | [Y] - NOVOTNY I., BRETERNITZ V. ET AL, "Thin Film Micrelectrode Arrays For Electrochemical Biosensors", 44TH INTERNATIONAL SCIENTIFIC COLLOQUIUM TECHNICAL UNIVERSITY OF ILMENAU, (19990920), XP002223449 [Y] 29 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890912), vol. 013, no. 412, Database accession no. (P - 932), & JP01152357 A 19890614 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - YOON H J ET AL, "Solid-state ion sensors with a liquid junction-free polymer membrane-based reference electrode for blood analysis", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (200006), vol. 64, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 8 - 14, XP004199278 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(99)00476-1 |