Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0165805 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | A3 | WO0165805 | 07.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160025 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2002 | A3 | WO0160025 | 16.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020040658 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020022656 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003526266 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003523141 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1234430 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1232628 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2007 | B1 | EP1232628 | 21.08.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5381401 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5381301 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0104452 | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2366594 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368513 | 09.09.2008 | C | CA2368513 | 07.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1498488 | 19.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1552147 | 01.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60125906D1 | 22.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01010240 | 30.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01010839 | 30.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20014793L | 02.10.2001 | L | NO20014793D0 | 02.10.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0140035 | 06.02.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20015151L | 29.11.2001 | L | NO20015151D0 | 22.10.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US0140034 | 06.02.2001 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002010765 | 24.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | US90378101 | 12.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6993584 | 31.01.2006 | B2 | US2002010792 | 24.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US90377901 | 12.07.2001 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002013840 | 31.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US90515101 | 13.07.2001 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7213077 | 01.05.2007 | B2 | US2002016851 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US90375501 | 12.07.2001 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7006480 | 28.02.2006 | B2 | US2002034173 | 21.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US90550201 | 13.07.2001 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002038373 | 28.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US90378001 | 12.07.2001 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7219158 | 15.05.2007 | B2 | US2002059435 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90383201 | 12.07.2001 | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7596802 | 29.09.2009 | B2 | US2002071436 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90521501 | 13.07.2001 | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7082467 | 25.07.2006 | B2 | US2002133596 | 19.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87902001 | 12.06.2001 | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6973497 | 06.12.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US66416500 | 18.09.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | US18159700 | 10.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8359405 | 22.01.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US18555300 | 28.02.2000 | US66207200 | 14.09.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1176788 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2006 | B1 | EP1176788 | 20.08.2003 | A3 | EP1176788 | 30.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175066 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2006 | B1 | EP1175066 | 19.05.2004 | A3 | EP1175066 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175064 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2006 | B8 | EP1175064 | 19.10.2005 | B1 | EP1175064 | 13.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175064 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175051 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2006 | B1 | EP1175051 | 13.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175051 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175050 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP1175050 | 20.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175050 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175045 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2006 | B8 | EP1175045 | 16.11.2005 | B1 | EP1175045 | 27.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175045 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175042 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP1175042 | 13.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175042 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175065 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2005 | B1 | EP1175065 | 13.08.2003 | A3 | EP1175065 | 23.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353295 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353325 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353328 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353329 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353332 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353339 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353345 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2353348 | 08.04.2008 | C | CA2353348 | 21.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60112674T | 14.06.2006 | T2 | DE60112674D1 | 22.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60114097T | 10.08.2006 | T2 | DE60114097D1 | 02.03.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60114942T | 17.08.2006 | T2 | DE60114942D1 | 22.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60116447T | 28.09.2006 | T2 | DE60116447D1 | 30.03.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60117485T | 12.10.2006 | T2 | DE60117485D1 | 27.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60117722D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60117723D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60118305D1 | 18.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22563000 | 15.08.2000 | US22002600 | 21.07.2000 |