EP1175065 - Method and system for improving network performance enhancing proxy architecture with gateway redundancy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Border, John 19605 Selby Avenue Poolesville, Maryland 20837 / US | 02 /
Butehorn, Matthew 1230 Leafy Hollow Circle Mt. Airy, Maryland 21771 / US | 03 /
Burrell, Ken 3 Monument Court Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/04] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306269.0 | 20.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | US20000220026P | 21.07.2000 Original published format: US 220026 P | US20000225630P | 15.08.2000 Original published format: US 225630 P | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175065 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175065 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175065 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H04L41/5022 (EP,US);
H04B7/18582 (EP,US);
H04B7/18584 (EP,US);
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04L12/4604 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L41/046 (EP,US);
H04L41/083 (EP,US);
H04L41/0896 (US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/30 (EP,US);
H04L45/306 (EP,US);
H04L45/308 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/193 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
H04L47/2433 (EP,US);
H04L47/2491 (EP,US);
H04L47/40 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L49/9042 (EP,US);
H04L49/9094 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L67/2871 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/566 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/161 (EP,US);
H04L69/163 (EP,US);
H04L69/165 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W28/10 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04L41/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/0873 (EP,US);
H04L63/0281 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L67/59 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/19] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Verbesserung der Netzwerkleistung mittels Verbesserung von Proxyarchitektur mit redundantem Gateway | [2002/04] | English: | Method and system for improving network performance enhancing proxy architecture with gateway redundancy | [2002/04] | French: | Procédé et système d'amélioration des performances d'un réseau par une architecture de proxy ameliorée avec passerelle redondante | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 14.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, SE | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.08.2005 | [2007/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0526240 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A]EP0871316 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-35 * abstract * * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5949753 (ALEXANDER JR CEDELL ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column A * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 18 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US6070073 (MAVEDDAT PAYAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15,17-22,24-29,31-35 * column 5, line 31 - line 46 * * column 6, line 5 - line 16 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 10 * * figures 1,5,8 * |