EP1176507 - Information processing method, inter-task communication method, and computer-executable program for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sueyoshi, Masahiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306320.1 | 23.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000222896 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000222896 | JP20000235605 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000235605 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176507 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176507 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F9/54 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G06F21/445 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | G06F9/54, G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/19] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, inter-task Kommunikationsverfahren und computerausführbares Programm dafür | [2002/05] | English: | Information processing method, inter-task communication method, and computer-executable program for the same | [2002/05] | French: | Méthode de traitement d'information, méthode de communication inter-tâches et programme exécutable par ordinateur correspondant | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0695993 (IBM [US]) [A] 10-20* the whole document *; | [A]EP0770957 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0695993 | JPH08106441 |