EP1178461 - Improved gas discharge display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okadu, Taku Mido-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8501 / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306596.6 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000236231 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000236231 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178461 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178461 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178461 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2927 (EP,US);
G09G3/293 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/12] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserte Gasentladungs-Anzeigeeinrichtung | [2002/06] | English: | Improved gas discharge display device | [2002/06] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à gaz amélioré | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0967589 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021]; figures 5,7 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093]; figures 12,14-17 *; | [X]WO9720301 (PLASMACO INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 8,9,11,12; claim 1 * * claims 3,7-10,12 * |