EP1178251 - Adjustable corner fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANDUIT CORPORATION 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park Illinois 60477-3091 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Panduit Corporation 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park, Illinois 60477-3091 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fugman, Kurt J 17265 S. Chinook Dr. Lockport, Illinois 60441 / US | 02 /
Walke, James L 652 Margaret Street Rockdale, Illinois 60436 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306620.4 | 02.08.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000631471 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: US 631471 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178251 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178251 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178251 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/26, H02G3/04 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H02G3/0425 (EP,US);
F16B2200/67 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/04] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einstellbarer Eckverbinder | [2002/06] | English: | Adjustable corner fitting | [2002/06] | French: | Joint d'angle ajustable | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 04.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 05.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2608726 (WAHL MICHEL [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]GB2250564 (RICH MULLER LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5469893 (CAVENEY JACK E [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 11; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US5753855 (NICOLI ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11 * figure 11 *; | [A]EP0978916 (BOCCHIOTTI SOC IND ELETTROTEC [IT]) [A] 1,3,10 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-4 * |