EP1287750 - Protein enhaced gelatin-like dessert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana Soybean Board, Inc. 5755 West 74th Street IN 46278 / US | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Ryan.D. 7034 North Tacoma Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | 02 /
Narismham, Ganesan. 3456 Hamilton. West Lafayette, Indiana 47907 / US | 03 /
Mulvaney, Faye. 5221 Washington Boulevard. Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306847.3 | 10.08.2001 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287750 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A23L33/185 (EP);
A23L29/256 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L33/16 (EP);
A23L33/17 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/5036, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/606, A23V2200/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Protein angereichertes Gelatine-ähnliches Desert | [2003/10] | English: | Protein enhaced gelatin-like dessert | [2003/10] | French: | Produit alimentaire de type desert sous form de gel, fortifié avec de protéine | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.10.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1046347 (OTSUKA FOOD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12,18-35 * page 3, lines 19-25; examples 2-5 * * page 5, lines 5-16 * * page 4, lines 34-45 *; | [X]WO0101789 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 3, lines 18-25; example 1 *; | [A]EP0887023 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-19 * example 2 *; | [A]US3968267 (OGASA KATSUHIRO, et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1,2 * |