EP1188699 - A posture correction device for correcting a posture of conveyed paper-like material and paper-like material processing apparatus provided with a posture correction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramitsu, Naruaki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306965.3 | 16.08.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000280843 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000280843 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188699 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1188699 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188699 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/02, B65H29/12, B65H7/14 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B65H9/002 (EP,US);
B65H2301/331 (EP,US);
B65H2404/14212 (EP,US);
B65H2511/24 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Korrigieren einer Stellung eines geförderten papierähnlichen Materials und Verarbeitungsapparat für papierähnliches Material mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2002/12] | English: | A posture correction device for correcting a posture of conveyed paper-like material and paper-like material processing apparatus provided with a posture correction device | [2002/12] | French: | Dispositif pour corriger une posture de matériaux semblable au papier et appareil de traitement de matériaux semblable au papier avec un tel dispositif | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH061498 ; | [A]JPS5917441 ; | [A]US4836527 (WONG LAM F [US]) [A] 1,20* figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US5662321 (BOROSTYAN STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1,20 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 50; figures 1,2,4; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940405), vol. 018, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 1588), & JP06001498 A 19940111 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1,20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840516), vol. 008, no. 104, Database accession no. (M - 296), & JP59017441 A 19840128 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,20 * abstract * |