Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100847233B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2008 | B1 | KR20020018164 | 07.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4058710B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2008 | B2 | JP2002134625 | 10.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1184909 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2006 | B1 | EP1184909 | 13.10.2004 | A3 | EP1184909 | 06.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60121685T | 02.08.2007 | T2 | DE60121685D1 | 07.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW525299B | 21.03.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6458669 | 01.10.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US65060600 | 30.08.2000 |