EP1184531 - Connecting fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states EMHART LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayuyama, T, c/o Pop Rivet Fastener KK Hosoda Noyori-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kataoka, K, c/o Mitsubishi Jidousha Kogyo KK 5-38-8 Shiba Minatoku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | 03 /
Nanba, M, c/o Minori Kogyo KK 100 Ijirino Soujya City Okayama 719-1154 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, R, c/o Minori Kogyo KK 100 Ijirino Soujya City Okayama 719-1154 / JP | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker UK 210 Bath Road Slough SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307140.2 | 22.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000268107 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000268107 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184531 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Classification | IPC: | E05D1/02, E05F1/12 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
E05D1/02 (EP,US);
E05F1/1269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungselement | [2002/10] | English: | Connecting fastener | [2002/10] | French: | Elément d'assemblage | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |